+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 17105058D-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1222ES1
- Printed as engrossed 17105058D-ES1
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 17105058D-S1
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102944D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 7, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 2, 2017: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
February 2, 2017: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor