+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 97 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/15/17
- Signed by President
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1221ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 17101684D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1221E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101684D