+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 580 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1221ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Orrock, Robinson, Guzman
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senators: Obenshain, Spruill, McPike
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendment
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Printed as engrossed 23102141D-E
- Read second time
- Amendment by Senator Surovell agreed to
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1221E
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102141D