+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 30, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0189)
On March 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 189 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB122ER)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 000255472
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
February 22, 2000: Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 1-N)
January 21, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (35-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2000: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor