+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Continued to 1995 in Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate-comm. substitute w/amdts.
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute with amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed LD7930728 (SB122ES1)
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: General Government
On February 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7930728 (SB122S1)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (13-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 1994: Continued to 1995 in Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1994: Reported from General Laws with sub. (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor