+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0968)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1218ER2)
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Gov's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recom (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 968 (effective-see bill)
On March 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1218ER)
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds. (24-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 999242666
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (37-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: Reported from Finance with amds. (24-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor