+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (57)
On April 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0921)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 921 (effective 7/1/07)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1218ER2)
- Reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1218ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 24, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 075931732-S2
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (30-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (30-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Tata, Hogan, Ware, O.
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senators: Hanger, Potts, Howell
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (0-Y 40-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1218H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 073498260-H1
- Read third time
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 073498260-H1
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement (Putney)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1218S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 075897712-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 075897712-S1
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 074615732