+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 224 (effective 3/16/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1217ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1217S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104082D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB939
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104082D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/14/15 15102661D