+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
On March 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 710 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1216ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Amendment by Mrs. Rhodes agreed to
- Read third time
- Committee amendments #1-2 agreed to
- Committee amendment # 3 void
- Passed House with amendments (91-Y 7-N)
- Amendment by Mr. Guest agreed to
- Amendment by Mrs. Watts agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 996566843
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
February 19, 1999: Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor