+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093109812
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2009: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor