+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education (Morgan)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1214E
- Printed as engrossed 098655220-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 098655220
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2009: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2009: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor