+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1031)
On May 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1031 (effective 7/1/99)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
- Chair rules Governor's recommendation not germane
- Placed on Calendar
On March 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- Governor's substitute printed 996798811-S1
On March 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1214ER)
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 993526828
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1999: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor