+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 502 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1214ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 19107492D-S2
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Delegates: Gilbert, Landes, VanValkenburg
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators: Newman, Locke, Carrico
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106645D-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1214H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106645D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1214S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105805D-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB1563 (Lewis)
- Committee substitute printed 19105805D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102333D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
February 22, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2019: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2019: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
February 13, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor