+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 294 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1214ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 15101109D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1214E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101109D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2015: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
January 20, 2015: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor