+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104766D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1213S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104766D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102154D