+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 13103705D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1210E
- Read second time
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (8-Y 4-N)
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103705D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
January 29, 2013: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
January 18, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2013: Reported from Transportation with amendment (8-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor