+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 384 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1209ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, and Natural Resources (Cox)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 075141108-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1209E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 075141108
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2007: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor