+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in C. N. R. (13-Y 7-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Substitute by Sen. Barry agreed to 9971728607-S2
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 996822607-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 991728607-S2 (Barry on February 5
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 9971728607-S2 (Barry)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 996822607-S1
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 992861607