+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0251)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (92-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N)
- Passed by until after the first recess
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1207ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 251 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/15/17
- Signed by President
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1207ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1207S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104705D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 17104705D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101934D