+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 11-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103296D-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator Barker agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1206ES1
- Printed as engrossed 21103296D-ES1
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 21103296D-S1
- Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102736D