+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21101126D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
January 26, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2021: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor