+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0644)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 644 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1201ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1201S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104152D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 13104152D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103540D
+ − Votes (8)
February 21, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2013: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor