+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
On March 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 792 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1200ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Delegate Scott, E.T. agreed to
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078418124
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N)
January 24, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2007: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor