+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 210 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0210)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB120ER)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 18107155D-H1
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107155D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB120H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107155D-H1
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105753D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB120S1
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105753D-S1
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 3-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On December 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101325D
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services