+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0816)
On April 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 816 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Substitute bill reprinted 966619176-S1
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB120ER)
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 966619176-S1
On March 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 2-N)
On March 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by conference committee
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 966619176-S1
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N)
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Conferees reappointed by House
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Conferees cannot agree
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- House requested #2 Conference committee
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senators: Lambert, Stosch, Houck
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Delegates: Cranwell, Stump, Rhodes
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to 2ND request (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ACCEDE TO 2ND CONFERENCE (40-Y 0-N)
- Second conferees appointed by Senate
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (22-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (100-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 38-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF. (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Cranwell, Stump, Rhodes
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Lambert, Houck, Stosch
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- House insisted on amendment
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
On January 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 964633753
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
March 9, 1996: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (38-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N)
March 8, 1996: VOTE: ACCEDE TO 2ND CONFERENCE (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: Reported from Finance with amd. (22-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 38-N)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF. (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1996: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor