+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0156)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 156 (effective 7/1/12)
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB120ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-0Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103247D
+ − Votes (8)
February 21, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2012: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2012: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2012: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2012: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2012: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor