+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 385 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB12ER)
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 11/17/03 044843760
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2004: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2004: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2004: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor