+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Stricken from docket by Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 5-N 1-A)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1195S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103201D-S1
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 21103201D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102246D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2021: Stricken from docket by Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
January 29, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 5-N 1-A)
January 27, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2021: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor