+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0887)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 887 (effective 7/1/11)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED EMERGENCY (36-Y 61-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (36-Y 61-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (26-Y 12-N 2-A)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (23-Y 12-N 2-A)
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1195ER)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 11105441D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1195H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105441D-H1
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11105441D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N 2-A)
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1195S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104800D-S1
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N 2-A)
- Incorporates SB1164
- Committee substitute printed 11104800D-S1
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102434D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (13)
April 6, 2011: VOTE: REJECTED EMERGENCY (36-Y 61-N)
February 24, 2011: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 24, 2011: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 24, 2011: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N 2-A)
February 1, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor