+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (73)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0772)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 772 (effective 7/1/15)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation #'s 16-19 (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation #'s 1-9, 15 and 20-23 (37-Y 59-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (37-Y 59-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation #'s 10-14 (42-Y 52-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (42-Y 52-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted in-part
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1195ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1195ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 2-N)
- Conference substitute printed 15105698D-S1
- Amended by conference committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Campbell, Lingamfelter, Sullivan
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators: Norment, Reeves, Saslaw
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute with amendments
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105058D-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
- Amendments by Delegate Lingamfelter agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments SB1195H1
- Passed House with substitute with amendments (97-Y 2-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15105058D-H1
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments #'s 1,3,4,5,6 agreed to
- Committee amendment #2 rejected
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator Norment agreed to
- Reengrossed by Senate as amended SB1195E2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Printed as reengrossed 15102658D-E2
- Engrossed bill reprinted 15102658D-E2
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1195E
- Printed as engrossed 15102658D-E
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102658D
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (18)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: REJECTED (42-Y 52-N)
April 15, 2015: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: REJECTED (37-Y 59-N)
February 27, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 2-N)
February 27, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2015: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
February 17, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
February 13, 2015: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
February 12, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 27, 2015: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2015: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor