+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 445 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1195ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N)
- Passed House (91-Y 6-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N)
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1195S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105329D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19105329D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102896D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 13, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N)
February 12, 2019: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N)
February 7, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N)
January 29, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
January 24, 2019: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2019: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor