+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 331 (effective 7/1/21)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1193ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 21104475D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1193H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21104475D-H1
- Read third time
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 21104475D-H1
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103811D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1193S1
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 21103811D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101815D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 22, 2021: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2021: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2021: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2021: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2021: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2021: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2021: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2021: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor