+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (71)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 771 (effective 7/1/15)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 90-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation #'s 1, 2 and 9 (91-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation #'s 3, 4, 6 and 7 (66-Y 25-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 25-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation #5 (1-Y 90-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House rejected Governor's recommendation #8 (28-Y 62-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (28-Y 62-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted in-part
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1193ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1193ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 1-N)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Conference substitute printed 15105520D-S3
- Amended by conference committee
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Norment, McWaters, Howell
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Albo, Massie, Toscano
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
- Passed House with substitute (95-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1193H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105154D-H1
- Read third time
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15105154D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute rejected 15104213D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104934D-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1193S2
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB1326
- Committee substitute printed 15104934D-S2
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB1326
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Committee substitute printed 15104213D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100604D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (17)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 25-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 90-N)
April 15, 2015: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: REJECTED (28-Y 62-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
February 27, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2015: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2015: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N)
February 25, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
February 23, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2015: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor