+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 573 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1192ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 17103059D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1192E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103059D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor