+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0291)
On March 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 291 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1190ER)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 013481244
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2001: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2001: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor