+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 571 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1189ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 073098141
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor