+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0060)
On March 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 60 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1188ER)
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (12-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 035956552
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2003: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor