+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (58)
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0874)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 874 (effective 7/1/09)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation amendment #4 (99-Y 0-N)
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Amendments specific and severable
- House rejected Governor's recommendation amendments #'s 1, 2 and 3 (40-Y 58-N)
- VOTE: --- REJECTED (40-Y 58-N)
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1188ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Communicated to Governor
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted in part
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1188ER)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 095650204-S2
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N)
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Cosgrove, Janis, Morrissey
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Blevins, Petersen, Edwards
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1188H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 095644472-H1
- Read third time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 095644472-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1188S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 095618204-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 095618204-S1
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 095585806
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (14)
April 8, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 8, 2009: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
April 8, 2009: VOTE: --- REJECTED (40-Y 58-N)
February 28, 2009: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 26, 2009: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2009: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N)
February 24, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
February 10, 2009: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor