+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 481 (effective 7/1/21)
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1187ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101168D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2021: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2021: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2021: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor