+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 437 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1187ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 28-N)
- Passed House with amendment (68-Y 28-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (18-Y 4-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1187S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104763D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee amendments rejected
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104763D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (11-Y 3-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103491D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
February 17, 2015: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 28-N)
February 11, 2015: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (18-Y 4-N)
February 9, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (11-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor