+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 89 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/14/17
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1182ER)
- Enrolled
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1182S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17105009D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB1212 (Wexton)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 17105009D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103501D
+ − Votes (6)
February 10, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2017: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor