+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 273 (effective 1/1/22)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
On February 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1182ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 21200419D-H1
- House substitute with amendments agreed to by Senate (29-Y 9-N 1-A)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N)
- Passed House with substitute with amendments (61-Y 37-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments SB1182H1
- Amendments by Delegate Heretick agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 21200419D-H1
- Read third time
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 21200419D-H1
- Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 11-N 1-A)
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100652D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 2021: House substitute with amendments agreed to by Senate (29-Y 9-N 1-A)
February 23, 2021: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N)
February 18, 2021: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
February 16, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
January 25, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 11-N 1-A)
January 20, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2021: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor