+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0682)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 682 (effective 3/20/17)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1180ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Pillion, Garrett, Hayes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senators: Chafin, Dunnavant, Barker
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 1-N)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendment
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment rejected
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1180E
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Dunnavant agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 17101154D-E
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 17101154D