+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2010 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: #4 Ethics (Special)
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On January 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100300D
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2010: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2010: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor