+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 690 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1178ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substitute #1 by Senator Ruff withdrawn
- Floor substitute printed to Web only 13104624D-S1 (Ruff)
- Floor substitute printed 13104714D-S2 (Ruff)
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute #2 by Senator Ruff agreed to 13104714D-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1178S2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N)
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101462D
+ − Votes (7)
February 13, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 7, 2013: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor