+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 524 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1176ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Assigned Finance sub: 2
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 095837340-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1176E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 095837340
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2009: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
February 2, 2009: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2009: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor