+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
On March 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 813 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1172ER)
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 993254760-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 993254760-H1
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 993254760-H1
- Read second time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 999107760-S1
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 999107760-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 999107760-S1
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Care
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 993438828
+ − Votes (7)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1999: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor