+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
On March 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 499 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1171ER)
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Education (24-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed bill reprinted 995252811-E
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed 995252811-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 995252811