+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Amendments by Senator Norment withdrawn
- Reading of amendment waived
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendment rejected
- Amendments by Senator Barker agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1171E
- Printed as engrossed 21100535D-E
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100535D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 16, 2021: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
January 21, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N)
January 15, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
January 13, 2021: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor