+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0413)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 413 (effective 3/23/11)
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1171ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1171S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105138D-S1
- Emergency clause added
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11105138D-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101345D
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
January 21, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2011: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor